THE ARGUS APPEAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity raises funds to fulfill its objectives, namely helping those who are less fortunate. The Charity aims to support local causes where it can make a difference. Funds are raised from all sectors of the local community by various fundraising events and from donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 August 1992: Standard registration
- 12 September 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1113226 THE SUSSEX COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- THE EVENING ARGUS CHRISTMAS APPEAL FUND (Previous name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £167.51k | £162.89k | £77.07k | £99.87k | £68.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.04k | £168.60k | £126.19k | £115.20k | £96.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 23 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 19 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 19 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 18 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 18 October 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/12/90 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 30/5/00
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS POVERTY HARDSHIP AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR BENEFITS OF ALL SORTS IN CASH AND IN KIND PARTICULARLY AT CHRISTMAS FOR LONELY AND NEEDY OLD PEOPLE AND UNDER PRIVILEDGED CHILDREN AND ANY OTHER PERSON CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SUSSEX AND PART HANTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window