LIVERPOOL CITIZEN ADVOCACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Matches and supports active citizenship partnerships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 19 August 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Catherine Deverdie | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Crowder | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leo Patrick Hardwick | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Shaw | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Cecilia Reynolds | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH MONAGHAN | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Collins Brown | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Black | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAN SLOAN | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
GED BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW KAVANAGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.76k | £4.02k | £4.77k | £5.35k | £6.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.62k | £7.98k | £5.85k | £6.23k | £6.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OR DISABILITY OF PERSONS WITHIN THE CITY OF LIVERPOOL SUFFERING ANY IMPAIRMENT OF THEIR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL FACULTIES
Area of benefit
CITY OF LIVERPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. BEDE'S CENTRE
FERN GROVE
LIVERPOOL
L8 0RZ
- Phone:
- 01517345404
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window