LAPAL CANAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the restoration of the Dudley No. 2 Canal from Hawne Basin in Halesowen to Selly Oak in Birmingfham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
Governance
- 21 August 1992: Standard registration
- THE LAPAL CANAL TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Lionel Frederick Hemingway | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael John Payne | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Struckett | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ANDREW HARDIE | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Peter Fisher | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Denis Pike | Trustee | 22 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Hugh Humphreys OBE | Trustee | 28 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
DR Tony Louis Whateley | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.19k | £200.52k | £45.37k | £118.13k | £9.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.36k | £24.58k | £5.75k | £289.91k | £49.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PESONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED, TO PROVIIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES AT OR NEAR TO THE SECTION OF THE DUDLEY NO2 CANAL FROM HALESOWEN TO THE WORCESTER BIRMINGHAM CANAL AT SELLY OAK BIRMINGHAM (POPULARLY CALLED THE LAPAL CANAL) INCLUDING THE RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE LAPAL CANAL ANK THE PROMOTION OF ITS USE BY ALL APPROPRIATE FORMS OF WATERBORNE TRAFFIC AND THE PROMOTION OF A PUBLIC FOOTPATH AND RIGHT OF WAY ALONG THE LENGTH OF THE CANAL AND THE TOW PATH AND THE FORMER HORSE PATH.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
285 Harborne Road
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 3JB
- Phone:
- 07751100810
- Email:
- membership@lapal.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window