THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ANAESTHETISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle aims and ongoing objectives are, within the fields of anaesthesia, critical care, pain medicine and perioperative medicine (1) promote and carry on research, (2) educate doctors to maintain the highest professional standards in their practice, (3) give further instruction and training and (4) educate the general public in these fields and through these objects ensure patient safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£14,616,918
Donations and legacies | £3.10k | |
Charitable activities | £13.42m | |
Other trading activities | £380.76k | |
Investments | £673.92k | |
Other | £136.90k |
Total expenditure:
£14,819,448
Raising funds | £904.27k | |
Charitable activities | £13.44m | |
Other | £476.46k |
£562,548 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £496,399 from 120 government contract(s) and £4,680 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.38m | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.44m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.38m | |
Charitable expenditure | £13.44m | |
Retained for future use | £360.02k |
People

125 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
2145 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 May 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Christopher Carey | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ramai Santhirapala | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davina Goodall-Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Golbourn | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew Tuck | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hany Choueiri | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Nicola Shannon | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Michael Patrick William Grocott | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Toni Louise Brunning | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosalind Clare Bacon | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jonathan Paul Thompson | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR Sarah Jane Ramsay | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.03m | £11.86m | £12.40m | £13.80m | £14.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.95m | £11.70m | £12.42m | £13.68m | £14.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £777.10k | £461.61k | £480.50k | £773.72k | £496.40k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £24.68k | £4.68k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £26.96k | £3.27k | £13.82k | £8.20k | £3.10k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £651.24k | £168.79k | £334.92k | £337.43k | £380.76k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.67m | £11.11m | £11.47m | £12.75m | £13.42m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £644.09k | £516.05k | £519.86k | £623.24k | £673.92k | |
|
Income - Other | £40.99k | £56.88k | £62.62k | £86.08k | £136.90k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £24.63k | £0 | £0 | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.10m | £11.21m | £11.98m | £12.84m | £13.44m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £845.62k | £490.16k | £444.96k | £635.92k | £904.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £250.29k | £277.04k | £446.10k | £428.45k | £384.89k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £72.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £43.83k | £13.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £207.57k | £476.46k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £14.95m | £14.91m | £14.64m | £14.30m | £13.99m | |
|
Long-term investments | £16.45m | £18.12m | £18.08m | £18.49m | £20.05m | |
|
Other assets | £6.21m | £6.76m | £6.58m | £6.91m | £6.30m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.20m | £6.01m | £5.59m | £5.95m | £6.23m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 11TH FEBRUARY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PROMOTE AND CARRY ON STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ANAESTHESIA AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; TO EDUCATE MEDICAL PRACTITIONERS TO MAINTAIN THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL COMPETENCE IN THE PRACTICE OF ANAESTHESIA FOR THE PROTECTION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; TO FURTHER INSTRUCTION AND TRAINING IN ANAESTHESIA BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS; AND TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO ANAESTHESIA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 28 May 2004 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ROYAL COLLEGE OF ANAESTHETISTS
CHURCHILL HOUSE
35 RED LION SQUARE
LONDON
WC1R 4SG
- Phone:
- 02070921610
- Email:
- finance@rcoa.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window