Trustees THE FRIENDS OF TUNBRIDGE WELLS AND RUSTHALL COMMONS

Charity number: 1013975
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Leale-Green Trustee 28 October 2024
OUR MOON EDUCATION
Received: On time
Anthony John Dalby Pawson Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Joy Ann Podbury Trustee 22 September 2021
None on record
Donald Roberts Clarke Trustee 30 April 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF COLEMAN'S HATCH HOLY TRINITY, EAST SUSSEX
Recently registered
Clive McAllister Trustee 30 April 2016
None on record
Clive Evans Trustee 15 March 2016
None on record
Christopher James GURR Trustee 17 March 2014
None on record
PETER SHEARBURN MIALL Trustee 17 March 2014
THE ALBERT DAWSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Dr IAN CHRISTOPHER BEAVIS Trustee
None on record