SOLIHULL SPORTS CLUB FOR THE DISABLED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enable disabled people within the Metropolitan Borough of Solihull and surrounding area to take part in competitive and non-competitive sports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 22 September 1992: Standard registration
- 27 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 27 January 2016: Funds transferred to 230264 THE ENTERPRISE CLUB FOR DISABLED PEOPLE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.36k | £1.44k | £1.77k | £1.28k | £955 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £1.85k | £2.52k | £2.35k | £3.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 10 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 24 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 18 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 19 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE DISABLED OF SOLIHULL OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED PERSONS BY ENABLING THEM TO TAKE PART IN ALL SPORTING AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window