SPRING HARVEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was dormant during the year, having transferred all of its activities, including the running of the Spring Harvest Christian teaching event, to a new charity called Essential Christian on 31 December 2008 (then known as Memralife Group), following the merger with International Christian Communications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev LYNDON BOWRING | Chair |
|
||||||
PETER TIMOTHY MARTIN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
RT REVD PETE BROADBENT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED AS A COMPANY LIMITED BY GUARANTEE ON 22 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 26 SEPTEMBER 1997, 16 DECEMBER 1998, 6 MARCH 2000, 7 MARCH 2001 AND 15 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE PROCLAMATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST WITHIN THE BRITISH ISLES AND IN PARTICULAR THE PROVISION AND ORGANISATION OF EDUCATIONAL AND EVANGELISTIC CONFERENCES.
Area of benefit
BRITISH ISLES
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 HORSTED SQUARE
UCKFIELD
EAST SUSSEX
TN22 1QG
- Phone:
- 01825769111
- Email:
- info@springharvest.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window