CHARLES PLUMPTRE JOHNSON WILL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees hold the Trust Fund for the benefit of Sevenoaks School with a gift over to the Great Ormond Street Hospital, if the Trustees and the School Governors are unable to agree as to the application of the Trust Fund. The Trustees meet at least once a year to discuss the Trust's objectives and the School's needs and to decide on donations or loans to fund, for example, sports facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 12 October 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Christopher George Charles Marquess of Abergavenny OStJ DL | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
THOMSON SNELL & PASSMORE TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Diana Rogers | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Annabel Mary Marr-Johnson | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
GUY ARCHIBALD INNES | Trustee | 21 June 2001 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.52k | £9.80k | £7.91k | £13.29k | £27.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.26k | £4.27k | £4.30k | £4.27k | £4.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED P.P.R. 9TH MAY 1938
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SEVENOAKS SCHOOL (FORMERLY SEVENOAKS GRAMMAR SCHOOL) SO LONG AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CP JOHNSON WILL TRUST AND THE SAID SCHOOL ARE IN AGREEMENT AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR THE HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN GREAT ORMOND STREET.
Area of benefit
SEVENOAKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thomson Snell & Passmore LLP
Heathervale House
2-4 Vale Avenue
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
TN1 1DJ
- Phone:
- 01892 701293
- Email:
- stuart.goodbody@ts-p.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window