THE PRINCE GEORGE GALITZINE MEMORIAL FUND FOR ST PETERSBURG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants to small projects in NW Russia that help young people with disabilities. In 1994, we created a specialist library and cultural centre at 46 Fontanka Embankment, in St Petersburg, Russia,'The Prince George Galitzine Memorial Library', the aim of which was to preserve Russian history of the 20th Century through books about Russia printed abroad, we no longer support the library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Russia
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 November 1992: Standard registration
- PRINCE GEORGE GALITZINE MEMORIAL LIBRARY (Working name)
- THE GALITZINE - ST PETERSBURG TRUST (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Galitzine | Chair | 18 October 1992 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Walker | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sutcliffe | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £183.17k | £103.18k | £99.49k | £42.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.62k | £146.25k | £68.16k | £87.43k | £17.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 September 2021 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 October 2020 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT DATED 20 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF URGENTLY NEEDED MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT PARTICULARLY FOR HOSPITALS IN ST PETERSBURG RUSSIA OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE IN PRACTICE ST PETERSBURG,RUSSIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Castle Street
Cirencester
GL7 1QD
- Phone:
- 02077272051
- Email:
- galitzinefund@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window