MALMESBURY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to provide a community transport service for the inhabitants of Malmesbury and its district who are in need of such service because of age, sickness, disability (mental or physical), poverty or because of a lack of availability of adequate and safe public passenger services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 November 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM POWER | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN BARSTOW | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN STEPHEN FAIRHURST | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MINTY | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Francis Sanderson | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|||||
VICTOR GORDON ROBERTS-PHARE | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Rice | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.60k | £10.85k | £88 | £892 | £1.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.66k | £30.78k | £390 | £498 | £280 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 OCTOBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN MALMESBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE A SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malmesbury Town Council
Town Hall
Cross Hayes
MALMESBURY
SN16 9BZ
- Phone:
- 01666822143
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window