Financial history RAYMOND WILLIAMS MEMORIAL TRUST SOCIETY

Charity number: 1015887
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £2.01k £2.10k £3.84k £4.69k £1.41k
Total expenditure £2.26k £1.81k £4.64k £3.52k £1.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A