ST GEMMA'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 1015941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The palliative care, treatment or relief of people with active,progressive and advanced illness without regard to their means, culture, faith or belief .The relief of those who have experienced loss and bereavement through the provision of counselling, advice and support. The provision of education and training for professionals and volunteers engaged in palliative care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1992: Standard registration
  • 08 June 2018: Funds received from 271657 NATIONAL HOSPITAL RADIO
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST GEMMA'S (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sister Susan Irwin Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Kim Halliday Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Lucy Ziegler Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Anna Kerruish Trustee 01 June 2024
None on record
Lisa Marie Hollidge Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Mukesh Parekh Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Bassem Keir Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Ann Murphy Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Brigid Sara Stephanie Reid Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Eileen Burns Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Kim Gay Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Rev Barry Miller Trustee 24 March 2020
None on record
Dr Jonathan Miles Smith Trustee 21 January 2020
None on record
Philomena Corrigan Trustee 21 January 2020
LIAISON GROUP WORKFORCE CHARITY
Recently registered
Hilary Barrett Trustee 10 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.63m £11.49m £13.42m £15.06m £13.99m
Total expenditure £11.10m £11.59m £12.39m £13.52m £14.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £763.23k £27.54k N/A
Income from government grants £4.02m £6.40m £4.05m £4.80m £4.51m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.39m £3.63m £4.04m £4.67m £3.27m
Income - Other trading activities £4.05m £1.85m £4.29m £5.06m £5.48m
Income - Charitable activities £3.97m £5.84m £4.88m £4.97m £4.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £219.07k £174.17k £165.22k £195.04k £313.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £49.26k £165.94k £254.18k
Income - Legacies £1.48m £1.25m £2.35m £3.11m £1.80m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.48m £8.21m £8.33m £9.13m £9.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.62m £3.38m £4.05m £4.39m £5.00m
Expenditure - Governance £62.92k £75.16k £106.88k £102.16k £106.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.25k £27.28k £29.13k £31.39k £32.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £3.17m £2.80m £2.56m £2.56m £2.55m
Long-term investments £5.32m £6.54m £6.75m £6.25m £6.67m
Other assets £4.12m £4.42m £6.16m £8.66m £6.81m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £865.51k £867.02k £1.31m £2.23m £1.18m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Gemmas Hospice
329 Harrogate Road
Moortown
Leeds
LS17 6QD
Phone:
01132185500