ROYAL VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity delivers practical support through the power of volunteering so that older people can get more out of life and aims to relieve poverty, distress and suffering in various sections of the community, primarily in the UK, by the provision of various services for individuals and such other purposes for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 March 2024
Total income:
£42,359,000
Donations and legacies | £5.64m | |
Charitable activities | £35.91m | |
Other trading activities | £435.00k | |
Investments | £291.00k | |
Other | £90.00k |
Total expenditure:
£41,572,000
Raising funds | £1.38m | |
Charitable activities | £40.19m | |
Other | £0 |
£27,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £7,135,242 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.38m | |
Charitable expenditure | £40.19m | |
Retained for future use | £787.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.38m | |
Charitable expenditure | £40.19m | |
Retained for future use | £814.00k |
People

663 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
14984 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 5 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- W R V S (Working name)
- WOMENS ROYAL VOLUNTARY SERVICE (Previous name)
- WRVS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dianne Elisabeth Hughes | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bamidele Oluwole Adeleye | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Eamon Dunne OBE | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mubasshir | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Wyndham Wadham | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Buckingham | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Michael Hughes | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Richard Robert Williams | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Dev Moorut | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Moore | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Paul Davis-Smith CBE | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2020 | 28/03/2021 | 28/03/2022 | 28/03/2023 | 28/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.75m | £36.07m | £35.94m | £38.48m | £42.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.91m | £37.24m | £40.18m | £39.98m | £41.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £85.44k | £11.59m | £8.52m | £5.26m | £7.14m | |
|
Income from government grants | £217.71k | £2.78m | £735.81k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.61m | £5.75m | £4.00m | £4.52m | £5.64m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £200.00k | £246.00k | £754.00k | £525.00k | £435.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.09m | £30.90m | £33.06m | £35.91m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £105.00k | £18.00k | £13.00k | £141.00k | £291.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £44.76m | £28.97m | £270.00k | £232.00k | £90.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £146.00k | £160.00k | £75.00k | £139.00k | £259.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £56.84m | £35.63m | £37.84m | £38.54m | £40.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.07m | £1.61m | £2.34m | £1.45m | £1.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £986.00k | £793.00k | £953.00k | £1.03m | £970.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.47m | £417.00k | £293.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £110.00k | £25.00k | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 29/03/2020 | 28/03/2021 | 28/03/2022 | 28/03/2023 | 28/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.76m | £2.57m | £3.19m | £4.17m | £2.54m | |
|
Long-term investments | £10.80m | £11.06m | £10.42m | £8.10m | £11.72m | |
|
Other assets | £11.85m | £12.18m | £8.57m | £8.89m | £7.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.96m | £6.61m | £7.21m | £7.70m | £7.27m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS, SUFFERING OR NEED AMONG ALL SECTIONS OF THE COMMUNITY PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY ALL CHARITABLE MEANS AND PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING:- (I) ASSISTANCE LARGELY IN KIND AND FACILITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN THE COMMUNITY; (II) ASSISTANCE IN KIND TO VICTIMS OF EMERGENCIES OR DISASTERS; (III) ADVICE AND FACILITIES TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE IN HOSPITAL, IN PRISON OR IN THE ARMED SERVICES AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND (B) SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Voluntary Service
29 Charles Street
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 3JP
- Phone:
- 02920739119
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window