SOUTH AND MID WALES CAVE RESCUE TEAM/TIM ACHUB OGOFAU DE A CHANOLBARTH CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Team shall be to relieve suffering and distress amongst persons or animals endangered by accident or natural hazards underground by the provision, at the request of the police, of search and rescue for any persons or animals endangered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

26 Trustee(s)
170 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 21 January 1993: Standard registration
- WEST BRECON CAVE RESCUE TEAM/TIM ACHUB OGOFAU GORLLEWIN BRYCHEINOG (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
26 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosa Brew | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Holmes | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Waite | Trustee | 21 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick De-Gare Pitt | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Craddy | Trustee | 16 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michal Poreba | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Dunbar | Trustee | 20 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Woodfield | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Dennis | Trustee | 17 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Gareth Davies | Trustee | 18 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sue Goodhead | Trustee | 18 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dan Thorne | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Keith Goodhead | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Boore | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Claire Vivian | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tom Foord | Trustee | 24 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Davies | Trustee | 24 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
SPENCER DREW FCA DIPPFS | Trustee | 13 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
Gary Mitchell | Trustee | 13 January 2008 |
|
|||||
William John Roe | Trustee | 18 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
Alan Braybrooke | Trustee | 20 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN CARTER | Trustee | 23 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR GARMAN | Trustee | 29 June 1997 |
|
|
||||
GARY IVOR EVANS | Trustee | 23 June 1996 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOPLING | Trustee | 27 June 1993 |
|
|
||||
Paul Dryden | Trustee | 27 June 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.55k | £37.28k | £63.92k | £40.30k | £16.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.32k | £22.87k | £18.66k | £13.63k | £9.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.21k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 1991 AS AMENDED 20 JANUARY 2002, 4 MAY 2003 AND 24 JANUARY 2010. as amended on 20 Jan 2019 as amended on 17 Jan 2021 as amended on 19 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS OR ANIMALS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENT OR NATURAL HAZARDS UNDERGROUND BY THE PROVISION,AT THE REQUEST OF THE POLICE,OF SEARCH AND RESCUE FOR ANY PERSONS SO ENDANGERED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 THE MALTINGS
PONTPRENNAU
CARDIFF
CF23 8EQ
- Phone:
- 02920198390
- Email:
- treasurer@smwcrt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window