Financial history DENTON WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1016588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.20k £12 £899 £1.74k £2.44k
Total expenditure £805 £132 £1.37k £1.86k £1.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A