FOUNDATION FOR CREDIT COUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundation for Credit Counselling's principal activities are to provide free debt advice to the financially distressed and following advice either via telephone or online, to provide a range of debt management solutions to meet client needs such as debt management plans and a range of insolvency solutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£54,731,000
Donations and legacies | £11.87m | |
Charitable activities | £39.38m | |
Other trading activities | £3.13m | |
Investments | £260.00k | |
Other | £87.00k |
Total expenditure:
£59,467,000
Raising funds | £2.76m | |
Charitable activities | £56.70m | |
Other | £2.00k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,248,919 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.76m | |
Charitable expenditure | £56.70m |
People

1115 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 20 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 7 |
£90k to £100k | 5 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 4 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 1993: Standard registration
- STEPCHANGE DEBT CHARITY (Working name)
- CCCS (Previous name)
- CONSUMER CREDIT COUNSELLING SERVICE (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Pope | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael St John Ashley | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Mary Harding | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Acton | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Jean MacDermid | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Wood | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Michael Caplan | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Jane Titcomb | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Helen Dean | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris Stern | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.56m | £60.56m | £60.98m | £62.00m | £54.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.70m | £63.40m | £61.59m | £59.94m | £59.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.74m | £10.50m | £12.10m | £12.45m | £3.25m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £997.00k | £1.47m | £810.00k | £5.04m | £11.87m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £5.05m | £4.58m | £4.38m | £3.98m | £3.13m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £48.10m | £53.56m | £53.50m | £52.82m | £39.38m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.00k | £28.00k | £1.00k | £25.00k | £260.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £403.00k | £926.00k | £2.28m | £134.00k | £87.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £51.01m | £58.80m | £58.52m | £57.07m | £56.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.72m | £3.44m | £3.07m | £2.87m | £2.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £367.00k | £342.00k | £349.00k | £378.00k | £425.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.98m | £1.16m | £0 | £3.00k | £2.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.53m | £7.04m | £6.23m | £3.47m | £1.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £16.58m | £16.58m | £16.38m | £22.25m | £18.19m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.18m | £5.53m | £5.13m | £6.18m | £4.77m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/02/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 APR 2019
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE IN DEBT (PARTICULARLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM) BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO RE-SCHEDULE AND RE-FINANCE THEIR BORROWINGS; (2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL EDUCATION TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO MANAGE THEIR FINANCES MORE EFFECTIVELY; (3) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF COUNSELLING CENTRES TO WHICH PERSONS MAY RESORT FOR ADVICE ON DEBT MATTERS GENERALLY; (4) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN INSOLVENCY PRACTICE TO WHICH SUCH PERSONS MAY RESORT AS AN ALTERNATIVE SOLUTION TO DEBT PROBLEMS; AND (5) THE ESTABLISHMENT OF SUCH OTHER SERVICES OR PRODUCTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS IN DEBT OR AT RISK OF FALLING INTO DEBT) ON THE SUBJECT OF FINANCIAL BUDGETING, FINANCIAL PRODUCTS AND FINANCIAL SERVICES
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 Albion Street
Leeds
LS2 8ER
- Phone:
- 08001381111
- Email:
- contactus@stepchange.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window