MID-SOMERSET FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage and advance the education of the public in the study, performance and appreciation of music, speech and drama, creative writing and dance. The charity holds a two week festival, based in Bath, annually in mid-March.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 04 February 1993: Standard registration
- 01 September 2017: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1166938 MID-SOMERSET FESTIVAL
- MID-SOMERSET FESTIVAL (Working name)
- MID-SOMERSET FESTIVAL AT BATH (Working name)
- MID SOMERSET COMPETITIVE FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.82k | £51.00k | £58.04k | £56.53k | £51.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.36k | £54.99k | £56.74k | £54.76k | £52.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | 23 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 20 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 20 February 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 26 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | 26 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 04 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | 04 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1952 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 1990, 14 OCTOBER 1999, 23 AUGUST 2006 AND 15 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDENTS PERFORMANCE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC SPEECH AND DRAMA AND ORIGINAL WRITING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window