BUXTON FESTIVAL FRINGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise an open arts festival which includes all genres and does not select nor censor. We exist to provide an opportunity for anybody to share their art with an appreciative audience in an open, accessible and affordable environment. We use our sponsorships to reduce as far as possible the cost of entry to our festival, currently down to 40 pounds at its cheapest rate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 08 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WALKER | Chair | 14 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Robert Harrison | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephanie Osborne | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Carole Garner | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Sandra Jowett | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Linda Rolland | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Robert Bowns | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Hamilton | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAM MASON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.77k | £3.03k | £8.12k | £12.96k | £12.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.18k | £2.58k | £7.42k | £13.42k | £13.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | £500 | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 October 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE,MAINTAIN,IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA,MIME,SINGING AND MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
106 St. Johns Road
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 6UT
- Phone:
- 07974385767
- Email:
- info@buxtonfringe.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window