Financial history NORTH TYNE AND REDEWATER CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1017356
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/05/2018 18/05/2021 18/05/2022 18/05/2023 18/05/2024
Total gross income £4.33k £200 £1.41k £2.44k £3.23k
Total expenditure £4.24k £1.60k £3.28k £3.80k £3.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A