BATTLEFIELDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation, interpretation and presentation of battlefields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 February 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Hart | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Rachael Elizabeth Whitbread | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ismini Pells | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
HOWARD WILLIAM SIMMONS | Trustee | 29 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Kevin James Winter | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Norman Bruce Sangster Logan | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gregg James Archer | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Austin | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony John Edmund Rich | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW PAUL JEFFREY | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julian Humphrys | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher May | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.03k | £50.60k | £139.78k | £56.00k | £56.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.74k | £70.57k | £41.75k | £72.35k | £63.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED 13 APRIL 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 AUG 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07 AUG 2021 as amended on 13 Dec 2021 as amended on 02 May 2015
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES,THE PRESERVATION,INTERPRETATION AND PRESERVATION OF BATTLE SITES AS EDUCATIONAL AND HERITAGE RESOURCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BATTLEFIELDS TRUST
CROWN HOUSE
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 07572 046988
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window