GROUNDWORK NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the public benefit, urban or rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation within the Area. To advance public education in environmental matters To promote the conservation, protections and improvement of physical and natural environment within the Area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,420,552
Donations and legacies | £83.24k | |
Charitable activities | £7.33m | |
Other trading activities | £924.11k | |
Investments | £61.32k | |
Other | £17.26k |
Total expenditure:
£8,475,730
Raising funds | £712.23k | |
Charitable activities | £7.76m | |
Other | £0 |
£5,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,709,878 from 128 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £712.23k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.76m |
People

174 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
537 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- GROUNDWORK WEST DURHAM (Working name)
- GROUNDWORK WEST DURHAM & DARLINGTON (Previous name)
- WEST DURHAM GROUNDWORK TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Roy Thurston | Chair | 19 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Steven Francis Cole | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zain Richardson | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Maxine Houston | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Davison | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Simmons | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amber Jade Jasmine Anderson | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Marion Fiona Schooler | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|||||
John Edward Pritchard | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DIANA CATHERINE PEARCE | Trustee | 25 September 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.83m | £6.51m | £9.14m | £9.65m | £8.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.82m | £6.47m | £8.68m | £9.56m | £8.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £494.28k | £391.07k | £406.07k | £557.35k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £251.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.71m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £15.22k | £550.43k | £27.21k | £22.99k | £83.24k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £701.90k | £465.76k | £724.80k | £787.10k | £924.11k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.84m | £5.37m | £8.29m | £8.56m | £7.33m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £60.93k | £53.41k | £52.56k | £219.65k | £61.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £214.88k | £64.28k | £45.03k | £62.69k | £17.26k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.22m | £6.07m | £8.08m | £8.89m | £7.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £599.96k | £668.05k | £712.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £9.50k | £14.18k | £13.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £598.06k | £402.48k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.78m | £1.72m | £1.73m | £1.78m | £1.64m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.21m | £2.19m | £2.19m | £2.19m | £2.19m | |
|
Other assets | £1.93m | £1.85m | £3.26m | £2.84m | £3.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.09m | £910.92k | £2.55m | £2.09m | £2.13m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28/08/1992, 08/08/1996, 05/10/96, 25/08/2005, 24/05/2006, 10/10/2006 & 08/05/2009. CERT INCORPORATED NAME CHANGE 29/05/2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/02/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON02/04/2011 02/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN THE NORTH EAST AND CUMBRIA REGIONS OF ENGLAND (THE 'AREA'); (2) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE LIVING IN OR WORKING IN OR RESORTING TO THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (3) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS AND OTHER WAYS OF BETTER CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME WHERESOEVER; (4 TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3)
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST AND CUMBRIA AREAS OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Groundwork N E & Cumbria
Unit 14 - Parsons Court
Welbury Way
Aycliffe Business Park
NEWTON AYCLIFFE
DL5 6ZE
- Phone:
- 01388662666
- Email:
- north.east@groundwork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window