N O P A N I C

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a confidential help-line, 0300 772 9844, 10-00am to 10-00pm Provides a night-time anxiety crisis telephone line, 01952 680835 Provides telephone recovery groups & one to one telephone mentoring to members. Provides books, CDs & DVDs to help overcome anxiety disorders. Provides information and support to families and carers of sufferers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 March 1993: Standard registration
- 23 August 2023: Funds received from 1019200 WELLINGTON COTTAGE CARE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Seal | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Craig Soutar | Trustee | 24 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Sarsons | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE SENIOR | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE FREDRICK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.94k | £93.34k | £63.87k | £54.83k | £83.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.05k | £74.39k | £74.89k | £71.17k | £74.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 April 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23/02/1993 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/2002 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/2006 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 27/08/2014 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ORGANISATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION, OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM PHOBIAS, OBSESSIVE COMPULSIVE DISORDER AND OTHER RELATED ANXIETY DISORDERS, WHICH INCLUDES THOSE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM TRANQUILLISER WITHDRAWAL PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
INTERNATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
51A Market Street
Oakengates
Telford
Telford
Shropshire
TF2 6AA
- Phone:
- 01952680460
- Email:
- admin@nopanic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window