PINEAPPLE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help the relief of poverty, hardship and distress in Penge and adjacent areas, particularly amongst the aged, infirm and the disaabled. To provide facilities for social welfare and recreation to those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
Governance
- 16 March 1993: Standard registration
- PINEAPPLE LUNCHEON CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Scale | Chair | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Morgan | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Bogle | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mongal | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Williams | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shireen Hoffman | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dahlia Lewis | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elsie Sutherland | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gus Stewart | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Thompson | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Egbert Blackman | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.06k | £344 | £749 | £7.67k | £21.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.34k | £7.49k | £18.74k | £22.29k | £44.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 May 2023 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 AUGUST 1992 AMENDED 22 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE INHABITANTS OF PENGE AND IN PARTICULAR THE AGED, THE INFIRM AND THE DISABLED. (B) TO PROVIDE, OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE PENGE, LONDON SE20
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anerley Business Centre
Anerley Town Hall
Anerley Road
LONDON
SE20 8BD
- Phone:
- 02086980409
- Email:
- pineappleplc2000@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window