THE GRIFFITH SMITH TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of needy former staff of the firm of Griffith Smith Solicitors in East and West Sussex
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 March 1993: Standard registration
- 06 August 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 August 2019: Funds transferred to 1018776 THE DEREK AND EILEEN DODGSON FOUNDATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2014 | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £1.48k | £1.69k | £1.93k | £1.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25 | £25 | £25 | £25 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 06 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 08 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2016 | 02 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
(A)TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY THE FIRM OF GRIFFITH SMITH DODD & RILEY OR BY SUCH FIRM OR FIRMS AS MAY SUCCEED TO AND CARRY ON THE PRACTICE OF THE SAID FIRM OF GRIFFITH SMITH SUCH EMPLOYMENT BEING OR HAVING BEEN AT ANY OFFICE OR OFFICES AT WHICH THE SAID FIRM OF GRIFFITH SMITH(OR ANY FIRM SUCCEEDING TO ITS PRACTICE AS AFORESAID) MAY FROM TIME TO TIME PRACTISE OR HAVE PRACTISED AND THE WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS AND OTHER DEPENDENTS OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN SO EMPLOYED (B)TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window