Trustees ST BARBE MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY
Charity number: 1018779

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR JOHN HUMPHREY DE TRAFFORD BT | Chair | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marc Aaron Heighway | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeffrey Anthony Lock | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Burton | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elsie Cheers | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Neil James McLocklin | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Pritchard | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Anthony Smith | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Helen Corbridge | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Dale Alderson | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony Charles King | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Amanda Jones | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mary Francis | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE MILLARD | Trustee | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA ANNE PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.