Financial history NORTHERN CONSORTIUM

Charity number: 1018979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.10m £4.97m £5.88m £6.60m £7.58m
Total expenditure £4.71m £4.74m £5.46m £6.75m £7.68m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £4.94m £0 £6.54m £7.49m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £5.83m £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.54k £3.81k £1.80k £23.29k £88.82k
Income - Other £5.08m £29.11k £50.85k £35.01k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.71m £4.74m £5.46m £6.75m £7.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £56.84k £73.23k £83.98k £87.10k £101.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £70.00k £70.00k £36.38k £135.67k £133.87k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0