Financial history VICTORIA ROAD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1020175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £134.94k £119.20k £117.97k £97.33k £132.89k
Total expenditure £104.20k £115.68k £134.46k £113.80k £124.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £91.95k £84.73k £117.14k
Income from government grants £120.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A