HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses for the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 27 April 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON CUNDALL | Chair |
|
||||||||
Thomas O'Boyle | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Juilet Diamond | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Imogen Liddle | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
PETER WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Rev John Beesley | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Hilary Delaney Hall | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Tim Gill | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Holcombe | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|||||||
MARK PAINTER | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Jean Jarvis MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.25k | £126.91k | £116.94k | £117.84k | £127.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.66k | £99.93k | £91.85k | £132.32k | £114.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31 DECEMBER 1992 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
1.THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES;2.SUBJECT TO PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS:A)FOR THE BENEFIT FOR THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME AND B) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED.3.A)IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LUDLOW WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.B)THE TRUSTEES MAY PAY FOR SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTION TO INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE OR WHICH UNDERTAKE IN RETURN TO PROVIDE SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR SUCH PERSONS.C)IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO PERSONS OTHERWISE ELIGIBLE THERFOR WHO ARE RESIDENT IMMEDIATELY OUTSIDE THE SAID PARISH BUT IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OUGHT NEVERTHELESS FOR SUFFICENT REASON TO BE TREATED AS IF RESIDENT THEREIN OR ARE LOCATED FOR THE TIME BEING WITHIN THAT PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LUDLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 JOCKEY FIELD
LUDLOW
SY8 1PU
- Phone:
- 01584813255
- Email:
- cewilliams1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window