LION SALT WORKS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of a restored industrial heritage working museum at the site of the Lion Salt Works in Marston, Northwich, which was the last working open pan salt works in the UK and is now a scheduled monument. Also education by the interpretation of the history of the site and former proprietors, the heritage of salt making in Cheshire and elsewhere, the science of salt and related products.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 27 April 1993: Standard registration
- LION SALT WORKS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Westlake | Chair | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Gerard Leonard | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bethaney Crickmore | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Ogden | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Naylor | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas George Knevitt Hunt | Trustee | 13 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HULME | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN BOYETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ALEXANDER HENRY TODD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12k | £306 | £143 | £228 | £245 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.05k | £633 | £250 | £419 | £490 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2009 as amended on 11 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY (1) THE PRESERVATION RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT ENHANCEMENT USE THE MAINTENANCE OF FEATURES AND OBJECTS OF HISTORICAL AND INDUSTRIAL INTEREST WHICH RELATE TO THE TRADITIONAL PRACTICES OF OPEN PAN SALT PRODUCTION AND (2) THE RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF THE SAID TRADITIONAL PRACTICES FOR PRESENTATION TO THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A WORKING MUSEUM AT THE RESTORED LION SALT WORKS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE CHESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Petrel Close
WINSFORD
Cheshire
CW7 1LB
- Phone:
- 01606551044
- Email:
- roeegg@aol.com
- Website:
-
lionsaltworkstrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window