STOCK HARVARD WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Womens Institute activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 19 May 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANE WARDLE | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
GIOVANNA IOFFREDA | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANIS GARLICK | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ADELE WALLIS | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN HUNT | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CHRISTINE HUGHES | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA KITCHIN | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MARGARET McALLISTER | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE FAIRMAN | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.84k | £2.43k | £958 | £2.45k | £5.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.47k | £1.59k | £1.57k | £2.61k | £4.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
The objects of the WI are to further the purposes of the Women’s Institute organisation
Area of benefit
BILLERICAY DOWNHAM GREAT BADDOW AND OTHERS SEE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Myln Meadow
Stock
Ingatestone
CM4 9NE
- Phone:
- 01277841031
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window