CHELTENHAM DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 1021577

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cheltenham District Scouts are part of the Scout Association which exists by authority of a Royal Charter, granted by King George V in 1912 and further Charters by King George VI and Queen Elizabeth II. The Cheltenham District Scout Association works within the Policy, Organisation and Rules of the Scouts Association to deliver adventure, development of and community work for and by Young People.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £41,631
Total expenditure: £37,356

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHELTENHAM DISTRICT SCOUT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Ann O'Donnell Trustee 01 December 2024
THE VINEY HILL CHRISTIAN ADVENTURE CENTRE
Received: On time
David Francis Cronk Trustee 24 January 2024
None on record
PETER JOHN AYLOTT Trustee 19 September 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHARLTON KINGS
Received: On time
Philip Andrew Horsfield Trustee 15 September 2023
None on record
David George Hall Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
ANN Beatrice Dorothy HASELER Trustee 16 September 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S CHARLTON KINGS
Received: On time
Wendy Binks Trustee 24 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WEST CHELTENHAM TEAM MINISTRY
Received: On time
Sarah Ann Hick Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
PATRICIA ANN HOPES Trustee 01 August 2001
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.71k £40.71k £36.98k £37.40k £41.63k
Total expenditure £44.69k £44.69k £22.90k £40.74k £37.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 March 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 March 2021 42 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
6 Sappercombe Lane
Charlton Kings
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 8LY
Phone:
01242 224874