Financial history WELLINGORE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1021874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.93k £1.06k £4.65k £3.73k £4.67k
Total expenditure £1.08k £2.21k £4.31k £3.71k £4.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A