Financial history GOREFIELD PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1021889
Charity reporting is up to date (226 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £59.42k £71.87k £93.11k £117.76k £129.39k
Total expenditure £70.38k £64.20k £74.24k £101.73k £109.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.63k N/A N/A N/A N/A