BARNBY-DUN EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Speakers on various subjects Educational outings Friendship for women
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Doncaster
Governance
- 09 June 1993: Standard registration
- 16 January 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 January 2019: Funds transferred to 513917 SOUTH YORKSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2013 | 01/10/2014 | 01/10/2015 | 01/10/2016 | 01/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.28k | £5.80k | £5.10k | £5.84k | £5.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.99k | £5.66k | £4.91k | £5.40k | £5.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2017 | 05 March 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2016 | 01 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2015 | 31 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window