Havens Hospices

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides relief to children and adults suffering from any chronic or life limiting illness, via the provision of residential hospice care, day care, education, training and support for patients and their families (or other carers), provided both within the organisation and in the community. Our care is provided free of charge to people regardless of faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£15,721,000
Donations and legacies | £5.71m | |
Charitable activities | £4.60m | |
Other trading activities | £5.02m | |
Investments | £252.00k | |
Other | £136.00k |
Total expenditure:
£16,674,000
Raising funds | £5.30m | |
Charitable activities | £11.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,356,377 from 2 government contract(s) and £2,244,836 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.30m | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.38m |
People

349 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
1295 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 02 June 1993: Standard registration
- 06 March 2017: Funds received from 1003437 SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST ...
- 11 June 2020: Funds received from 1099562 THE J'S HOSPICE
- 24 November 2021: Funds received from 286171 JOHN MOUNTAIN MEMORIAL FUND
- 20 June 2022: Funds received from 1006623 OPEN DOORS
- 23 February 2023: Funds received from 1078781 THE ROTARY CLUB OF BRENTWOOD BREAKFAST TRUST FUND
- 21 November 2023: Funds received from 287377 THE TRINITY URC BROMLEY TRUST
- FAIR HAVENS (Working name)
- HAVENS HOSPICES (Working name)
- LITTLE HAVENS (Working name)
- HAVENS CHRISTIAN HOSPICE (Previous name)
- SOUTH EAST ESSEX CHRISTIAN HOSPICE (Previous name)
- SOUTH EAST ESSEX CHRISTIAN HOSPICE (FAIR HAVENS) (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Edwards | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Knowles | Trustee | 03 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakesh Krishnan | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Sweeney | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elizabeth Matthews OBE | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Jane Mell | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Bernard Duell | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Roberts-Smith | Trustee | 29 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.75m | £12.91m | £12.19m | £12.75m | £15.72m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.54m | £10.14m | £10.76m | £13.55m | £16.67m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £182.00k | £375.00k | £38.40k | £9.90k | £2.36m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.79m | £2.02m | £2.37m | £2.08m | £2.24m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £7.54m | £7.01m | £5.36m | £5.77m | £5.71m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.06m | £2.99m | £4.29m | £4.51m | £5.02m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £2.39m | £2.37m | £2.30m | £4.60m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £67.00k | £0 | £12.00k | £114.00k | £252.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.11m | £519.00k | £157.00k | £59.00k | £136.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.48m | £1.21m | £1.12m | £2.13m | £1.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.60m | £6.99m | £7.16m | £9.12m | £11.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.56m | £3.16m | £3.59m | £4.43m | £5.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £100.80k | £99.29k | £93.00k | £77.64k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £11.14k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £2.38m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.09m | £17.66m | £17.66m | £16.96m | £17.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £6.29m | £8.99m | £8.99m | £10.29m | £9.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.67m | £1.19m | £1.19m | £1.15m | £1.47m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MAR 1993 AS AMENDED 28 NOV 1997, 9 NOV 2000, 6 NOV 2002, 12 NOV 2003, 10 NOV 2004, 19 NOV 2009. ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 25 NOV 2010. OBJECTS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 9 DEC 2010. as amended on 16 Nov 2018 as amended on 22 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) TO PROVIDE CARE AND SUPPORT TO PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WHO HAVE A CHRONIC, LIFE THREATENING OR TERMINAL CONDITION, OR ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY DISABILITY OR DISEASE, AND TO SUPPORT (BY WAY OF RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF) THEIR FAMILIES, RELATIVES AND LOVED ONES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE TO COMPLEMENT THE OBJECTS IN ARTICLE 3.1 (A)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fair Havens Hospice
226 Priory Crescent
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS2 6PR
- Phone:
- 01702220350
- Email:
- ssmith@havenshospices.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window