Financial history HONEYBEES PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 1022441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £112.29k £130.13k £145.84k £153.41k £169.87k
Total expenditure £107.20k £100.89k £116.65k £142.87k £185.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £76.77k £76.92k £90.37k £73.79k £91.56k