Financial history NOAH'S ARK NURSERY GROUP

Charity Number: 1022584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £112.19k £116.15k £113.14k £161.94k £167.09k
Total expenditure £108.17k £110.32k £120.43k £128.85k £140.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.83k £85.83k £60.36k £90.92k £108.19k