LOUISE DOBSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity made grants to many causes including childen's, learning difficulty, poverty relief and religious charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 June 1993: Standard registration
- DOBSON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRISTOPHER NEIL YOUNG DOBSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Theodosia Mary Young Black | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emily Katherine Young Parker | Trustee | 20 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN MICHAEL JOSEPH LEACH | Trustee | 05 June 1986 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.25k | £4.15k | £5.75k | £6.88k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £5.75k | £5.52k | £5.75k | £6.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 175 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 JUNE 1986
Charitable objects
FOR AND AMONG SUCH CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS SOCIETIES OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD STABLES
Rookery Farm
Hacheston
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 0DJ
- Phone:
- 07754592899
- Email:
- cnydobson@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window