LLANDRINDOD WELLS SPA TOWN TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust maintains the old spa buildings in the Victorian Town of Llandrindod Wells, Powys, Mid Wales. We have two buildings one to provide space for healing and well being. We have many different treatments available eg Osteopath, Reiki, Counselling, Indian Head and Hot Stones Massages, Mindfulness and Life Coaching. We also have hearing specialists and ear wax removal services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Powys
Governance
- 23 June 1993: Standard registration
- LLANDRINODD WELLS SPA TOWN TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Rumbold | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steven P Jones | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Jones | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Rosmari Meredudd | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Julia Peart-Watson | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Francesca Coleby | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.60k | £36.18k | £14.34k | £17.24k | £17.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.14k | £33.25k | £26.07k | £29.15k | £29.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £239 | £31.04k | £2.00k | £1.31k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 1993 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2008. as amended on 14 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF LLANDRINDOD WELLS AND ITS VICINITY,TO PRESERVE,RESTORE,ENHANCE AND IMPROVE THE HISTORICAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CULTURAL HERITAGE AS A LEADING VICTORIAN SPA TOWN
Area of benefit
TOWN OF LLANDRINDOD WELLS AND ITS VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llandrindod Wells Spa Town Trust Lt
Rock Park
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
LD1 6AE
- Phone:
- 01597824102
- Email:
- info@spatowntrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
therockpark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window