Financial history Rotary Club of Swindon North & Thamesdown

Charity number: 1023031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £14.26k £6.83k £63.35k £17.15k £20.73k
Total expenditure £20.43k £3.40k £49.57k £28.50k £20.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A