Financial history 19TH BOLTON (BOLTON SCHOOL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1023147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £29.15k £12.49k £17.13k £15.47k £15.50k
Total expenditure £11.44k £7.18k £10.76k £28.85k £11.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A