ST JAMES GREAT PACKINGTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORT OF MAINLY LOCAL CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 June 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD AYLESFORD | Chair |
|
||||||||
The Honourable James Daniel Finch-Knightley | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
The Honourable Georgina Lucy Finch-Knightley | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
NICHOLAS PHILIP BARLOW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.18k | £32.35k | £25.94k | £19.30k | £37.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.10k | £24.70k | £24.38k | £29.11k | £24.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION REPAIR AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CHURCH OF ST JAMES GREAT PACKINGTON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION. 3. THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS AND EDUCATION THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PUBLIC CONCERTS LECTURES AND MEETINGS IN THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PACKINGTON ESTATE ENTERPRISES LTD
PACKINGTON PARK
MERIDEN
COVENTRY
CV7 7HF
- Phone:
- 01676522020
- Email:
- sam@packingtonestate.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window