Trustees DUNSTABLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 1023533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP SPICER Chair 19 June 2024
None on record
TREVOR GOUGH Trustee 19 December 2024
None on record
MATTHEW SLADE-PEDRICK Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
GLORIA MARTIN Trustee 12 July 2023
None on record
Ian Wilkinson Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Charlotte Jackson Trustee 28 August 2018
None on record
Richard Short Trustee 16 June 2011
3RD DUNSTABLE ST PETER'S SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
MARGARET WILSON Trustee
None on record
JOYCE LAWRENCE Trustee
None on record
JEANETTE BETTERTON Trustee
None on record