Financial history CLIVIGER TRUST

Charity Number: 1023535
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £14.15k £16.57k £14.21k £13.41k £0
Total expenditure £13.16k £12.79k £12.27k £12.38k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A