FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S AND ST PAUL'S CRANFIELD

Charity number: 1023935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for the restoration, maintenance and improvement to St Peters and St Pauls Cranfield

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £812
Total expenditure: £434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Isaac Timothy Pain Trustee 07 November 2020
TOWN LANDS
Received: On time
FOUR COUNTIES GOSPEL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Wendy Gascoin Norris Trustee 29 July 2018
None on record
Amanda Distin Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
HAYDN DISTIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £787 £1.49k £422 £438 £812
Total expenditure £1.19k £652 £422 £4.44k £434
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 November 2024 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 November 2024 655 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Court Road
Cranfield
Bedford
MK43 0DR
Phone:
01234751451
Website:

No information available