ST GEORGE AND ST ATHANASIOUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH

Charity number: 1024015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities Help the general public /mankind

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £102,546
Total expenditure: £96,430

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 July 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
His Grace BISHOP ANTONY Chair 23 November 2011
ST. MICHAEL & ST. BISHOY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST ABANOUB COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, WEST AND NORTH YORKSHIRE
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST GEORGE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH PLYMOUTH
Received: On time
ST. ANTONY COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST PETER AND ST PAUL COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH BOURNEMOUTH
Received: On time
ST MARINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH-BRISTOL
Received: On time
ARCHANGEL MICHAEL & SAINT MINA COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST MARY & ST THEODORE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, HASTINGS
Received: On time
ST MARY AND ST MOSES THE PROPHET COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH, DONCASTER
Received: On time
ST JOHN COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST AUGUSTINE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST ATHANASIUS COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH
Received: On time
ST. ATHANASIUS MONASTERY
Received: On time
St Mary and St John Coptic Orthodox Church and Centre
Recently registered
Ramiz Paramythas Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Amir Michael Trustee 01 March 2023
ST JOHN'S COLLEGE, DURHAM
Received: On time
Dr Nabil Naroz Trustee 20 September 2020
None on record
Dr Hany Gabra Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record
Samir Nashed Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record
SEIF ASAAD Trustee 27 January 2012
ST. ATHANASIUS MONASTERY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £295.09k £108.57k £98.15k £106.73k £102.55k
Total expenditure £105.34k £90.14k £82.53k £125.51k £96.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 05 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 08 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 20 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 20 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 Kingston Drive
Whitley Bay
NE26 1JJ
Phone:
01912972155
Website:

No information available