ROYAL LOGISTIC CORPS ASSOCIATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of benevolence funding to soldiers, past and present, and their dependents who are in need. Supporting the RLC Museum and heritage projects. Improving the efficiency of the Corps by providing financial support for fraternity, communication, sport and adventure training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,272,651
Donations and legacies | £1.66m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £18.00k | |
Investments | £1.60m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,528,072
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.53m | |
Other | £0 |
£116,408 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.53m |
People

7 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cyprus
- Guernsey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 November 1970: Standard registration
- THE RLC ASSN TRUST FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Major General Simon Tony Hutchings OBE | Chair | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
WO Class One Corps SM Steven Muir | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
WO Class One RSM Tina Joanne Jones | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Lee James Naismith Daley QVCS | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Phillip Stone | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Patrick Andrew Allen | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Brigadier Anna Clare Luedicke CBE | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Major General Angus Stuart James Fay CB | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Richard Edward Parkinson | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier David Stewart Clouston MBE | Trustee | 31 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Maj Gen MALCOLM DAVID WOOD CBE | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lt Col Nigel Shepherd | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Christopher Murray CBE | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier PAUL ANTHONY EVANS OBE | Trustee | 11 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR GENERAL JOHN SEUMAS KERR CBE | Trustee | 18 May 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.70m | £2.86m | £2.74m | £3.03m | £3.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.52m | £1.99m | £2.33m | £3.03m | £3.53m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.26m | £1.48m | £1.35m | £1.53m | £1.66m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £18.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.35m | £1.37m | £1.32m | £1.44m | £1.60m | |
|
Income - Other | £84.38k | £2.02k | £22.85k | £12.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.52m | £1.99m | £2.33m | £3.03m | £3.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £67.38k | £12.02k | £24.15k | £19.93k | £26.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £389.46k | £288.07k | £496.36k | £448.79k | £585.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £88 | £0 | £108 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.20k | £9.62k | £8.88k | £17.11k | £11.59k | |
|
Long-term investments | £38.93m | £41.40m | £45.97m | £40.12m | £40.33m | |
|
Other assets | £906.34k | £1.28m | £1.25m | £748.90k | £375.05k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £7.99k | £19.49k | £11.50k | £50.57k | £21.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 December 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2021 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2021 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 JUNE 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION OF 6 JANUARY 1997, RESOLUTION OF 4 MAY 1999 AND SECOND DEED OF VARIATION OF 17 NOVEMBER 2005 AND THIRD DEED OF VARIATION OF 16 NOVEMBER 2006 AND FOURTH DEED OF VARIATION OF 4 APRIL 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE (A) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE CORPS IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE CORPS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE TRADITIONS OF THE CORPS AND FORMING CORPS; AND (B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO: (I) ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SICKNESS; AND (2) ARE SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CORPS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE FORMING CORPS OR THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 16 November 1970 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
RHQ THE RLC
Building 204
Worthy Down Camp
Winchester
Hampshire
SO21 2RG
- Phone:
- 01962887157
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window