MONTACUTE PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1024088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Montacute Pre-School provides high quality care and education through play to children aged from 2 years to school age. The Pre-School follows the early years/foundation stage curriculum as stipulated by Ofsted and accepts children in receipt of Early Years Entitlement.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £112,582
Total expenditure: £95,545

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 July 1993: Standard registration
  • 14 January 2025: Funds received from 1033661 PARCROFT PRESCHOOLPLAYGROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MONTACUTE PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lorraine Johnson Chair 04 March 2024
None on record
Harriet Blackburn Trustee 14 November 2024
None on record
Harriet Raeburn Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Karen Rivers Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Keeley Salter Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
Melanie Wilkins Trustee 28 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £90.96k £81.88k £87.77k £92.59k £112.58k
Total expenditure £89.39k £89.37k £85.48k £90.32k £95.55k
Income from government contracts £57.65k £60.46k £57.83k £63.31k £77.45k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 12 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 15 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 19 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Baptist Church School Rooms
South Street
MONTACUTE
TA15 6XD
Phone:
01935 822022
Website:

No information available