LOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of Community space at Louth Library used for a variety of community activities mainly by local groups and societies, and also for musical and other performances and presentations plus some commercial and private lettings. LCA also occasionally promotes arts orientated activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 04 August 1993: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 September 2009: Standard registration
- 21 December 2021: Funds transferred to 219279 THE ROYAL BRITISH LEGION
- 21 December 2021: Funds transferred to 500151 AYSCOUGH HALL TRUST
- 21 December 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £10.46k | £9.22k | £9.86k | £6.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.79k | £7.45k | £7.42k | £7.31k | £5.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOUTH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SOCIAL WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
LOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window