Financial history BOB CHAMPION CANCER TRUST

Charity Number: 1024664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £296.91k £246.85k £337.55k £230.37k £615.93k
Total expenditure £285.63k £342.33k £351.54k £329.96k £395.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.44k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £209.88k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £359.34k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.71k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £199.74k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £220.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £174.93k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £130.13k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0